Jun 14 2019 | Application (18A1326) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 9, 2019 to September 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions |
Jun 18 2019 | Application (18A1326) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until September 7, 2019. |
| |
Sep 09 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 15, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Oct 08 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2019 to November 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Oct 09 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2019. |
| |
Oct 15 2019 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Ethics Bureau at Yale. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Nov 08 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2019 to January 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Nov 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 13, 2020. |
| |
Jan 09 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 13, 2020 to March 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 10 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 16, 2020. |
| |
Mar 12 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2020 to April 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 15, 2020. |
| |
Apr 10 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2020 to April 17, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 13 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 17, 2020. |
| |
Apr 17 2020 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
May 04 2020 | Reply of petitioner Lisa Marie Montgomery filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
May 06 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020. |
| |
May 26 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The Ethics Bureau at Yale GRANTED. |
| |
May 26 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |
Jun 19 2020 | Petition of Lisa Marie Montgomery for rehearing not accepted for filing. (July 07, 2020) |
| |
Jun 28 2020 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
| Main Document |
Jul 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED. |
| |
Aug 03 2020 | Rehearing DENIED. |
| |