SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-5719 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-5719 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Robert Keith Ray, Petitioner
v.
Colorado
Docketed:
August 27, 2019
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Colorado
Case Numbers:
(15SC268)
Decision Date:
April 8, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
May 20, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 19 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 26, 2019)
Proof of Service
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Sep 25 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 26, 2019 to November 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Sep 27 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 25, 2019.
Nov 25 2019
Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 12 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 26 2019
Reply of petitioner Robert Keith Ray filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 13 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gail Kathryn Johnson
Counsel of Record
Johnson & Klein, PLLC
1470 Walnut Street
Suite 101
Boulder, CO 80302
gjohnson@johnsonklein.com
3034441885
Party name: Robert Keith Ray
Attorneys for Respondent
L. Andrew Cooper
Counsel of Record
Office of the Colorado Attorney General
1300 Broadway St.
Denver, CO 80203
andrew.cooper@coag.gov
720-508-6465
Party name: Colorado
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##