Docket for 19-5570 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 05 2019 | Application (18A1289) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 18, 2019 to August 16, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Jun 11 2019 | Application (18A1289) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 16, 2019. | | | Aug 12 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 13, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix | Aug 30 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 13, 2019 to October 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 15, 2019. | | | Oct 15 2019 | Brief of respondent William Stange, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Oct 31 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019. | | | Nov 11 2019 | Reply of petitioner Walter Barton filed. (Distributed) | | Main Document | Nov 18 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|