Docket for 19-5568 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 08 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 12, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Sep 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2019 to October 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 15, 2019. | | | Oct 08 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2019 to November 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 09 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 14, 2019. | | | Nov 08 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2019 to December 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 16, 2019. | | | Dec 10 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2019 to January 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 11 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 15, 2020. | | | Jan 15 2020 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 29 2020 | Reply of petitioner Keith D. Nelson filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 30 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2020. | | | Feb 24 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|