Docket for 19-5493 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 29 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 6, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetition | Sep 03 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 6, 2019 to October 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 06 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 7, 2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Oregon in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Oct 24 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019. | | | Nov 12 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|