SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 19-5489 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 19-5489 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Azibo Aquart, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
August 7, 2019
Linked with 18A1203
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(12-5086)
Decision Date:
December 20, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
March 7, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 17 2019
Application (18A1203) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2019 to August 4, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
May 21 2019
Application (18A1203) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 4, 2019.
Aug 05 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 6, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Proof of Service
Aug 28 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 6, 2019 to October 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 30 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 7, 2019.
Oct 07 2019
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 24 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Beverly Van Ness
Counsel of Record
Law Office of Beverly Van Ness
233 Broadway
Suite 2704
New York, NY 10279
bvanness.law@gmail.com
2122740402
Party name: Azibo Aquart
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##