Docket for 19-5298 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 06 2019 | Application (18A1151) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2019 to July 22, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | May 09 2019 | Application (18A1151) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 22, 2019. | | | Jul 22 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 23, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Aug 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 23, 2019 to September 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 27 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 23, 2019. | | | Sep 11 2019 | Brief of respondent Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden in opposition filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Sep 24 2019 | Reply of petitioner Kendrick Simpson filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 26 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019. | | | Oct 15 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|