Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-511
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-511
Title:Facebook, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Noah Duguid, et al.
Docketed:October 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15320)
   Decision Date:June 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:August 22, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 20, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Facebook, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Nov 18 2019Waiver of right of respondent Noah Duguid to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Credit Union National Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Encore Capital Group, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of ACA International, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 25 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 02 2019Reply of petitioner Facebook, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Response Requested. (Due January 3, 2020)
Jan 03 2020Brief of respondent Noah Duguid in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jan 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 10 2020Reply of petitioner Facebook, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 07 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Facebook, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/8/2020.
Jul 08 2020Supplemental brief of respondent Noah Duguid filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 09 2020Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition.
Jul 24 2020Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jul 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 4, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 16, 2020.
Sep 04 2020Brief of respondent United States in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 04 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Sep 04 2020Brief of petitioner Facebook, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Professional Association for Customer Engagement and Noble Systems Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Home Depot, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Salesforce.com, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Midland Credit Management, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Credit Union National Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Quicken Loans, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amici curiae of “On-Demand” Technology Platforms filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Life Insurance Direct Marketing Association, American Property Casualty Insurance Association and Consumer Credit Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Healthcare Companies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 8, 2020.
Oct 08 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Oct 08 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Oct 16 2020Brief of respondent Noah Duguid filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Brief amici curiae of 21 Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2020Brief amici curiae of State of North Carolina, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Main Street Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Brief amici curiae of John McCurley and Dan Deforest filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Motion for divided argument filed by petitioner Facebook, Inc.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Henning Schulzrinne filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2020Brief amici curiae of National Consumer Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2020CIRCULATED
Nov 09 2020Motion for divided argument filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Nov 16 2020Reply of petitioner Facebook, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Reply of respondent United States in support of petitioner filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 08 2020Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.; and Jonathan Y. Ellis, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as respondent supporting petitioner) For respondents: Bryan A. Garner, Dallas, Tex.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Facebook, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sergei Lemberg
    Counsel of Record
Lemberg Law, LLC
43 Danbury Road
Wilton, CT 06897

slemberg@lemberglaw.com
203-653-2250
Party name: Noah Duguid
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States in support of petitioner
Bryan A. GarnerGarner & Garner LLP
8133 Inwood Rd.
Dallas, TX 75209-3337

bgarner@lawprose.org
2147668064
Party name: Noah Duguid
Other
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

cbarthold@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Keith Bradley
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (U.S.) LLP
1801 California Street, Suite 4900
Denver, CO 80202

keith.bradley@squirepb.com
303-894-6156
Party name: Home Depot, Inc.
Alan Jay Butler
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center
1519 New Hampshire Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

butler@epic.org
2024831140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al.
Julian Richard Ellis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
410 17th Street, Suite 2200
Denver, CO 80202

jellis@bhfs.com
303-223-1142
Party name: Credit Union National Association, Inc.
Albert Quoc Giang
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
633 West Fifth Street
Suite 1600
Los Angeles, CA 90071

agiang@kslaw.com
(213) 629-9040
Party name: “On-Demand” Technology Platforms
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Quicken Loans, LLC
Jeffrey Ryan Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

jeffreyjohnson@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
    Counsel of Record
Kazerouni Law Group APC
245 Fischer Ave., Suite D-1
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

ak@kazlg.com
800-400-6808
Party name: John McCurley and Dan Deforest
Keith James Keogh
    Counsel of Record
Keogh Law, LTD
55 W. Monroe St, Suite 3390
Chicago, IL 60603

keith@keoghlaw.com
312-726-1092
Party name: 21 Members of Congress
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al.
Ernesto Rafael Palomo
    Counsel of Record
Locke Lord LLP
111 South Wacker Drive
Suite 4100
Chicago, IL 60606

epalomo@lockelord.com
3124430477
Party name: Life Insurance Direct Marketing Association, American Property Casualty Insurance Association and Consumer Credit Industry Association
Ryan Young Park
    Counsel of Record
North Carolina Department of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

rpark@ncdoj.gov
9197166400
Party name: State of North Carolina, et al.
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: salesforce.com, inc.
Maxwell Vaughn Pritt
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
44 Montgomery Street, 41st Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

mpritt@bsfllp.com
(415) 293-6800
Party name: Healthcare Companies
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-637-6379
Party name: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Michele Ann Shuster
    Counsel of Record
Mac Murray & Shuster, LLP
6525 West Campus Oval, Suite 210
New Albany, OH 43054

mshuster@mslawgroup.com
6149399955
Party name: Professional Association for Customer Engagement and Noble Systems Corporation
Kris Skaar
    Counsel of Record
133 Mirramont Lake Drive
Woodstock, GA 30189

kskaar@skaarandfeagle.com
770 427 5600
Party name: Dr. Henning Schulzrinne
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe
Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(312) 759-5947
Party name: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Tara Twomey
    Counsel of Record
National Consumer Law Center
7 Winthrop Square
Boston, MA 02110

TTwomey@me.com
617 542-8010
Party name: National Consumer Law Center, Consumer Federation of America, and Consumer Reports
Steven Gregory White
    Counsel of Record
Gray Reed & McGraw LLP
1601 Elm Street
Suite 4600
Dallas, TX 75201

gwhite@grayreed.com
214-954-4135
Party name: ACA International, Inc.
John A. Yanchunís
    Counsel of Record
James Hoyer, et al.
4830 W. Kennedy Blvd.
Suite 147
Tampa, FL 33609

jyanchunis@forthepeople.com
8132230931
Party name: Main Street Alliance

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543