Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-43
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-43
Title:Power Analytics Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Operation Technology, Inc., et al.
Docketed:July 5, 2019
Linked with 18A1325
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1428)
   Decision Date:January 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:March 21, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2019Application (18A1325) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 19, 2019 to August 18, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Application (18A1325) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 1, 2019.
Jul 01 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 5, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 20 2019Response Requested. (Due October 21, 2019)
Oct 21 2019Brief of respondent Operation Technology Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Reply of petitioner Power Analytics Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 02 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Power Analytics Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert F. Ruyak
    Counsel of Record
RuyakCherian LLP
1700 K Street NW
Suite 810
Washington, DC 20006

robertr@ruyakcherian.com
2028381561
Party name: Power Analytics Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
John D. Vandenberg
    Counsel of Record
Klarquist Sparkman, LLP
121 S.W. Salmon Street
Suite 1000
Portland, OR 97204

john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
503-595-5300
Party name: Operation Technology Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543