Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-416
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-416
Vide 19-453
Title:Nestlé USA, Inc., Petitioner
v.
John Doe I, et al.
Docketed:September 27, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55435)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, John Doe I, et al. VIDED
Blanket Consent
Oct 25 2019Waiver of right of respondents John Doe I, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Coca-Cola Company filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chevron Corporation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Confectioners Association, the World Cocoa Foundation, and the European Cocoa Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of CATO INSTITUTE filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 04 2019Response Requested. (Due December 4, 2019)
Nov 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2019 to December 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2019.
Dec 12 2019Brief of respondents John Doe I, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2019Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Dec 23 2019Reply of petitioner Nestlé USA, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 26 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 04 2020Supplemental brief of petitioner Nestlé USA, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 19-453 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jul 02 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-416. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-416. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jul 22 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Jul 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 31, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 14, 2020. VIDED.
Aug 26 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, John Doe I, et al. VIDED.
Blanket Consent
Aug 27 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Nestlé USA, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 31 2020Joint appendix filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief of petitioner Nestlé USA, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2020Brief of petitioner Cargill, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Coca-Cola Company filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Allied Educational Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2020Brief amici curiae of The World Cocoa Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors of International Law, Foreign Relations Law and Federal Jurisdiction filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 1, 2020. VIDED.
Sep 29 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 08 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Oct 08 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Oct 14 2020Brief of respondents in 19-416 (response to merits brief of Nestle USA, Inc.) filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2020Brief of respondents in 19-453 (response to merits brief of Cargill, Inc.) filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of EarthRights International filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Yale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Global Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Tony's Chocolonely filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Access Now, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Foreign Lawyers filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Center for Justice & Accountability and Human Rights First filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Small and Mid-Size Cocoa and Chocolate Companies filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Government Officials filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of International Law Scholars, Former Diplomats, and Practitioners filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of International Human Rights Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Oxfam America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Grant & Eisenhofer ESG Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors of Legal History, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress Senator Blumenthal, Representative Smith, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Nuremberg Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2020CIRCULATED
Nov 02 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Nov 13 2020Reply of petitioner Nestlé USA, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2020Reply of petitioner Cargill, Inc. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Nestlé USA, Inc.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Cargill, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Lindsey Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Schonbrun Seplow Harris & Hoffman LLP
200 Pier Ave. STE 226
Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

hoffpaul@aol.com
3107177373
Party name: John Doe I, et al.
Other
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
William Joseph Aceves
    Counsel of Record
Calif. Western School of Law
225 Cedar Street
San Diego, CA 92101-3090

wja@cwsl.edu
619-515-1589
Party name: Foreign Lawyers
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Allied Educational Foundation
John Bellinger Bellinger III
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.bellinger@arnoldporter.com
202-942-6599
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, the National Foreign Trade Council, the National Association of Manufacturers, and the Organization for International Investment
Jeffrey Alan Brauch
    Counsel of Record
Regent University School of Law
1000 Regent University Drive
Virginia Beach, VA 23464

jeffbra@regent.edu
757-352-4660
Party name: Center for Global Justice
Carmen Ka Man Cheung
    Counsel of Record
Center for Justice and Accountability
One Hallidie Plaza #750
San Francisco, CA 94102

ccheung@cja.org
415-544-0444
Party name: Center for Justice & Accountability and Human Rights First
Sophia Sabrina Cope
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

sophia@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Access Now, Article 19, Center for Long-Term Cybersecurity, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Privacy International and Professor Ronald Deibert
William S. Dodge
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Davis, School of Law
400 Mrak Hall Drive
Davis, CA 95616

wsdodge@ucdavis.edu
510-421-0494
Party name: International Law Scholars
Jay W. Eisenhofer
    Counsel of Record
Grant and Eisenhofer P.A.
485 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
(646) 722-8500
Party name: Grant & Eisenhofer ESG Institute
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, the National Association of Manufacturers, the National Foreign Trade Council, Global Business Alliance, and United States Council for International Business
Samuel Estreicher
    Counsel of Record
NYU School of Law
40 Washington Sq. South
New York, NY 10012

samuel.estreicher@nyu.edu
212-998-6226
Party name: Professors of International Law, Foreign Relations Law and Federal Jurisdiction
Agnieszka M. Fryszman
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC
1100 New York Ave.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

afryszman@cohenmilstein.com
202-408-4600
Party name: Members of Congress Senator Blumenthal, Representative Smith, et al.
Katherine M. Gallagher
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Rights
666 Broadway, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10012

kgallagher@ccrjustice.org
2126146455
Party name: International Human Rights Organizations
Tyler Richard Giannini
    Counsel of Record
International Human Rights Clinic, Harvard Law School
6 Everett Street, 3rd Floor
Cambridge, MA 02138

giannini@law.harvard.edu
(617) 495-9263
Party name: Professors of Legal History, et al.
Jack L. Goldsmith
    Counsel of Record
1563 Massachusetts Ave.
Cambridge, MA 02138

goldsmith.jack@gmail.com
(617) 384-8159
Party name: Chevron Corporation
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jennifer M. Green
    Counsel of Record
University of Minnesota Law School
229 19th Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55455

jmgreen@umn.edu
612-625-7247
Party name: Nuremberg Scholars
Oona A. Hathaway
    Counsel of Record
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

Oona.hathaway@yale.edu
203-343-8482
Party name: Yale Law School Center for Global Legal Challenges
Michael David Hausfeld
    Counsel of Record
Hausfeld LLP
1700 K Street, NW
Suite 650
Washington, DC 20006

mhausfeld@hausfeld.com
2025407148
Party name: Oxfam America, et al.
Richard L. Herz
    Counsel of Record
EarthRights International
1612 K Street N.W.
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

rick@earthrights.org
860-233-4938
Party name: EarthRights International
Harold Hongju Koh
    Counsel of Record
Peter Gruber Rule of Law Clinic
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06520-8215

harold.koh@ylsclinics.org
2034641801
Party name: Former Government Officials
Kevin Paul Martin
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
Exchange Place
Boston, MA 02109

kmartin@goodwinlaw.com
6175701000
Party name: The World Cocoa Foundation, et al.
Owen C. Pell
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1095

opell@whitecase.com
212-819-8891
Party name: Cato Institute
Charity Starr Ryerson
    Counsel of Record
Corporate Accountability Lab
6214 N. Glenwood Ave.
Chicago, IL 60660

charity@corpaccountabilitylab.org
3178507384
Party name: Small and Mid-Size Cocoa and Chocolate Companies
Charity Starr Ryerson
    Counsel of Record
Corporate Accountability Lab
6214 N. Glenwood Ave.
Chicago, IL 60660

charity@corpaccountabilitylab.org
3178507384
Party name: Tony's Chocolonely
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: The Coca-Cola Company
Beth Van Schaack
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

bethvs@stanford.edu
6507255310
Party name: International Law Scholars, Former Diplomats, and Practitioners

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543