Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-329
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-329
Title:Winston-Salem Industries for the Blind, Petitioner
v.
PDS Consultants, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 11, 2019
Linked with 19A84
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2379, 2017-2512)
   Decision Date:October 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2019Application (19A84) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 8, 2019 to September 9, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jul 22 2019Application (19A84) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 9, 2019.
Sep 09 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Winston-Salem Industries for the Blind.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Oct 03 2019Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from October 11, 2019 to November 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 12, 2019, for all respondents.
Oct 10 2019Brief amici curiae of Alphapointe, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association for the Employment of People Who Are Blind filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of SourceAmerica filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of City of Winston-Salem filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Council of the Blind filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Industries for the Blind filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2019Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2019 to December 9, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 9, 2019, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Winston-Salem Industries for the Blind
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America; PDS Consultants, Inc.
David Scott Gallacher
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 100
Washington, DC 20006

dgallacher@sheppardmullin.com
2027471921
Party name: PDS Consultants, Inc.
Other
Robert Reeves Anderson
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
370 Seventeenth Street, Suite 4400
Denver, CO 80202

Reeves.Anderson@arnoldporter.com
303-863-2325
Party name: SourceAmerica
Thomas Mark Bondy
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

tbondy@orrick.com
202-339-8406
Party name: American Council of the Blind
Angela Ingram Carmon
    Counsel of Record
City of Winston-Salem
Post Office Box 2511
Winston-Salem, NC 27102

angelac@cityofws.org
336-747-7404
Party name: City of Winston-Salem
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Capital Appellate Advocacy PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@capitalappellate.com
202-729-6337
Party name: Alphapointe, et al.
Tracye Winfrey Howard
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

twhoward@wileyrein.com
202-719-7000
Party name: NATIONAL INDUSTRIES FOR THE BLIND
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: National Association for the Employment of People Who Are Blind

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543