Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-243
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-243
Title:Richard M. Camacho, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 23, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(19-0157/AR)
   Decision Date:May 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John N. Maher
    Counsel of Record
Maher Legal Services PC
26 South Third Street
Number 68
Geneva, IL 60134

johnmaher@maherlegalservices.com
7084688155
Party name: Richard Camacho
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543