Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1459
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1459
Title:Polaris Innovations Limited, Petitioner
v.
Kingston Technology Company, Inc., et al.
Docketed:July 6, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1768)
   Decision Date:January 31, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:April 2, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 5, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 21 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Polaris Innovations Limited VIDED
Blanket Consent
Jul 22 2020Memorandum of respondent United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 29 2020Amicus brief of The New York Intellectual Property Law Association submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2020Brief amicus curiae of TiVo Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew D. Powers
    Counsel of Record
Tensegrity Law Group LLP
555 Twin Dolphin Dr.
Suite 650
Redwood Shores, CA 94065

matthew.powers@tensegritylawgroup.com
6508026000
Party name: Polaris Innovations Limited
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Melvin C. Garner
    Counsel of Record
Leason Ellis LL P
One Barker Avenue
White Plains, NY 10601

Garner@Leasonellis.com
(914) 288-0022
Party name: The New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: TiVo Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543