Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1442
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1442
Vide 20-105
Title:Willie Earl Carr, et al., Petitioners
v.
Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Docketed:July 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5079, 19-5085)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2020)
PetitionAppendix
Jun 29 2020Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jul 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 31, 2020 to August 31, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Jul 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 31, 2020.
Aug 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 31, 2020 to September 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Aug 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 30, 2020.
Sep 29 2020Brief of respondent Saul, Andrew M. filed.
Main Document
Oct 14 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/30/2020.
Oct 14 2020Reply of petitioners Willie Earl Carr, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/6/2020.
Nov 09 2020Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-105 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Nov 09 2020Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 19-1442. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 19-1442. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Nov 09 2020As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Dec 09 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, John J. Davis, Thomas Hilliard, Kimberly L. Iwan, Destiny M. Thurman
Blanket Consent
Dec 09 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners in No. 20-105.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 11 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners in No. 19-1442.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Collective of Social Security Administration Administrative Law Judges in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 28 2020Brief of petitioners John J. Davis, Thomas Hilliard, Kimberly L. Iwan, Destiny M. Thurman (in 20-105) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2020Brief of petitioners Willie Earl Carr, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 3, 2021. VIDED.
Dec 31 2020Brief amici curiae of Social Security, Government Benefit Program and Administrative Law Professors and Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020Brief amici curiae of National Organization of Social Security Claimants' Representatives, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Disability Representatives filed.VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2021Amicus brief of The New Civil Liberties Alliance & Cato Institute not accepted for filing. (January 05, 2021 - Corrected version to be submitted).
Jan 04 2021Brief amici curiae of The New Civil Liberties Alliance & Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners in No. 19-1442 GRANTED.
Jan 11 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners in No. 20-105 GRANTED.
Jan 14 2021CIRCULATED
Jan 25 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit.
Jan 27 2021Brief of respondent Saul, Andrew M., Commissioner of Social Security filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 28 2021Record received from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit is electronically filed.
Feb 17 2021Reply of petitioners Willie Earl Carr, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2021Reply of petitioners John J. Davis, Thomas Hilliard, Kimberly L. Iwan, Destiny M. Thurman filed (in 20-105). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Argued. For petitioners: Sarah M. Harris, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Austin Raynor, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5599
Party name: Willie Earl Carr, et al.
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: John J. Davis, Thomas Hilliard, Kimberly L. Iwan, Destiny M. Thurman
Lisa Schiavo BlattWilliams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Willie Earl Carr, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Saul, Andrew M.
Other
Jon C. Dubin
    Counsel of Record
Rutgers Law School
123 Washington Street
Newark, NJ 07102

jdubin@law.rutgers.edu
(973) 353-3186
Party name: Social Security, Government Benefit Program and Administrative Law Professors and Scholars
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

bth@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Robert Everett Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
16781 Chagrin Blvd. #256
Shaker Heights, OH 44120

rjohnson@ij.org
703.682.9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Carolyn A. Kubitschek
    Counsel of Record
Lansner & Kubitschek
325 Broadway
Suite 203
New York, NY 10007

ckubitschek@lanskub.com
212-349-0900
Party name: National Organization of Social Security Claimants' Representatives, AARP and AARP Foundation
Jared Alan McClain
    Counsel of Record
The New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

jared.mcclain@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
8563050034
Party name: The New Civil Liberties Alliance & Cato Institute
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Collective of Social Security Administration Administrative Law Judges
Chanakya Arjun Sethi
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Stekloff LLP
130 W 42nd St
24th Floor
New York, NY 10036

csethi@wilkinsonstekloff.com
212-294-8926
Party name: National Association of Disability Representatives

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543