Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-1401
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-1401
Title:April Hughes, et al., Petitioners
v.
Northwestern University, et al.
Docketed:June 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2569)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 11, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 23, 2020 to August 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 24, 2020.
Aug 24 2020Brief of respondents Northwestern University, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 09 2020Reply of petitioners April Hughes, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 08 2021Supplemental brief of respondents Northwestern University, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 10 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners April Hughes, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jul 22 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 3, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 21, 2021.
Aug 02 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, April Hughes, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Sep 03 2021Brief of petitioners April Hughes, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Sep 03 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Sep 08 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Northwestern University, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Investment Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Service Employees International Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Samuel Halpern filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2021Brief amici curiae of AARP, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 6, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: April Hughes, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Craig C. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
300 N. LaSalle Dr. - 50th Floor
Chicago, IL 60654

cmartin@willkie.com
312-728-9000
Party name: Northwestern University, et al.
Other
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
William Anthony Brendan Finbarr Birdthistle
    Counsel of Record
Chicago-Kent College of Law
565 W. Adams Street
Chicago, IL 60661

wbirdthistle@kentlaw.edu
6173884048
Party name: Investment Law Scholars
J. Peter Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd, Bloch, Bennett, Cervone, Auerbach & Yokich, LLP
8 S. Michigan Avenue
19th Floor
Chicago, IL 60603

jpdowd@laboradvocates.com
312-372-1361
Party name: Service Employees International Union
Dara Swartz Smith
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation Litigation
601 E St, . NW
Washington, DC 20049

dsmith@aarp.org
12024346280
Party name: AARP, AARP Foundation, et al.
Jeffrey Robert White
    Counsel of Record
American Association for Justice
777 6th Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20001-3723

jeffrey.white@justice.org
202 617 5620
Party name: American Association for Justice

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543