Docket for 19-1191 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 03 2020 | Application (19A753) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2020 to April 3, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 13 2020 | Application (19A753) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 3, 2020. | | | Mar 27 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 21 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 1, 2020 to June 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 22 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2020. | | | Apr 30 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Ohio Prosecuting Attorneys Association filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 01 2020 | Brief amici curiae of The States Of Texas, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, And Utah filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 12 2020 | Brief of respondent Shawn Ford in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 12 2020 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Shawn Ford. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 19 2020 | Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed. | | Main Document | May 19 2020 | Reply of petitioner State of Ohio filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 26 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/11/2020. | | | Jun 15 2020 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. | | | Jun 15 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|