Docket for 19-1100 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 31 2019 | Application (19A735) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 21, 2020 to February 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 02 2020 | Application (19A735) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 20, 2020. | | | Feb 04 2020 | Application (19A735) to extend further the time from February 20, 2020 to March 5, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Written RequestProof of Service | Feb 04 2020 | Application (19A735) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 5, 2020. | | | Mar 05 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2020) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 30 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2020 to June 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 01 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 26, 2020. | | | Apr 08 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 08 2020 | Brief amici curiae of John H. Blume, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 26 2020 | Brief of respondent State of Arizona in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020. | | | Jun 09 2020 | Reply of petitioner Leroy D. Cropper filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 29 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|