Docket for 19-1054 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 06 2019 | Application (19A642) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2019 to February 23, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 17 2019 | Application (19A642) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 24, 2020. | | | Feb 21 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2020) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 26 2020 | Brief amici curiae of National Association for Public Defense, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 26 2020 | Brief of respondent Gloria Gross in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 02 2020 | Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 15, 2020 to May 19, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 02 2020 | Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari until May 19, 2020, granted. | | | May 18 2020 | Reply of petitioner Christa Gail Pike filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 19 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020. | | | Jun 08 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|