Docket for 18A719 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 09 2019 | Application (18A719) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2019 to March 30, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 11 2019 | Application (18A719) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 1, 2019. | | |
|