Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A660
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A660
Title:Michael Gould, et al., Applicants
v.
Mark Morgan, et al.
Docketed:December 21, 2018
Linked with 18-1272
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2202)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2018Application (18A660) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2019 to April 1, 2019, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Application (18A660) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until April 1, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Michael Gould, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543