SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18A179
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18A179
Title:
Fredric Russell Mance, Jr., et al., Applicants
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:
August 17, 2018
Linked with 18-663
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(15-10311)
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2018
Application (18A179) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 18, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Aug 17 2018
Application (18A179) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 19, 2018.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan Gura
Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314
alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: Fredric Mance, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Sessions, Jefferson, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##