Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A118
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A118
Title:Sharonell Fulton, et al., Applicants
v.
City of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:August 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2574)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2018Application (18A118) for injunctive relief pending appeal, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Response to application (18A118) requested by Justice Alito, due Monday, August 13, by 5 p.m. ET.
Aug 13 2018Response to application from respondent City of Philadelphia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Reply of applicant Sharonell Fulton, et al. filed.
Reply
Aug 30 2018Application (18A118) referred to the Court.
Aug 30 2018Application (18A118) denied by the Court. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would grant the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Leonard Rienzi
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

rienzi@law.edu
2025070834
Party name: SHARONELL FULTON, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Eleanor N. Ewing
    Counsel of Record
City of Philadelphia Law Department
1515 Arch Street, 15th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102

eleanor.ewing@phila.gov
2156835012
Party name: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543