Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18A629
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18A629
Title:Virginia House of Delegates, et al., Applicants
v.
Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.
Docketed:December 13, 2018
Linked with 18-281
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(3:14cv852)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2018Application (18A629) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 14 2018Response to application (18A629) requested by The Chief Justice, due Thursday, December 20, 2018, by noon ET.
Dec 20 2018Response to application from respondents Virginia State Board of Elections, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Response to application from respondents Golden Bethune Hill, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 21 2018Reply of applicant Virginia House of Delegates, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Jan 08 2019Application (18A629) referred to the Court.
Jan 08 2019Application (18A629) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Virginia House of Delegates, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23225

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
8047867240
Party name: Virginia State Board of Elections, James B. Alcorn, Virginia Department of Elections, Christopher E. Piper, Clara Belle Wheeler, Singleton B. McAllister
Marc Erik Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole, LLP
700 13th St, NW
Ste. 600
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1609
Party name: Golden Bethune Hill, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543