Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-995
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-995
Title:Crunch San Diego, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Jordan Marks
Docketed:January 30, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-56834)
   Decision Date:September 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2019 to April 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2019.
Feb 21 2019Agreement to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 02109

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Crunch San Diego, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
    Counsel of Record
Kazerouni Law Group APC
245 Fischer Ave., Suite D-1
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

ak@kazlg.com
800-400-6808
Party name: Jordan Marks

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543