Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-9846
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-9846
Title:Bradford Metcalf, Petitioner
v.
S. Kallis, Warden
Docketed:June 27, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-7260)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 29, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 10 2019Waiver of right of respondent S. Kallis, Warden to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. As the petitioner has repeatedly abused this Court's process, the Clerk is directed not to accept any further petitions in noncriminal matters from petitioner unless the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) is paid and the petition is submitted in compliance with Rule 33.1. See Martin v. District of Columbia Court of Appeals, 506 U. S. 1 (1992) (per curiam).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bradford Metcalf#09198-040
P.O. Box 340
Salters, SC 29590

Party name: Bradford Metcalf
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: S. Kallis, Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543