Docket for 18-9838 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 10 2019 | Application (18A1176) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2019 to June 24, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | May 15 2019 | Application (18A1176) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 24, 2019. | | | Jun 24 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 29, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 29, 2019 to August 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 19 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 28, 2019. | | | Aug 28 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 12 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|