Docket for 18-971
|
Jan 25 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 26 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Mattis, Sec. of Defense, James to respond filed. | | | Feb 26 2019 | Waiver of Mattis, Sec. of Defense, James of right to respond not accepted for filing. (April 02, 2019 -- Duplicate submission) | | | Mar 06 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019. | | | Mar 25 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|