Docket for 18-9698 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 30 2019 | Application (18A1134) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 14, 2019 to June 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | May 03 2019 | Application (18A1134) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 13, 2019. | | | Jun 13 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 18, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jul 18 2019 | Brief of respondent People of the State of California in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Jul 18 2019 | Certificate of Service of People of the State of California not accepted for filing. (July 22, 2019 -- Duplicate submission) | | | Jul 22 2019 | Certificate of Service filed with respect to brief in opposition of respondent State of California. | | Proof of Service | Aug 01 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|