SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-9676 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-9676 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Randy Ethan Halprin, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:
June 14, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(17-70026)
Decision Date:
December 17, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
January 29, 2019
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jul 15 2019
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director of TDCJ Institutions Division in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Aug 01 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 28 2019
Reply of petitioner Randy Halprin filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tivon Schardl
Counsel of Record
Federal Defender, Capital Habeas Unit, Western District of Texas
919 Congress, Suite 950
Austin, TX 78701
Tivon_Schardl@fd.org
7372073008
Party name: Randy Halprin
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Wren Morris
Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
300 W. 15th St.
Austin, TX 78701
jennifer.morris@oag.texas.gov
5129362991
Party name: Lorie Davis, Director of TDCJ Institutions Division
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##