Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-948
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-948
Title:In Re Grand Jury Subpoena
Docketed:January 22, 2019
Linked with 18A669
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3071)
   Decision Date:December 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2018Application (18A669) for a stay and application for leave to file the application under seal, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Dec 23 2018UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the order of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia holding the applicant in contempt, including the accrual of monetary penalties, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Monday, December 31, 2018, by noon, and further order of The Chief Justice or of the Court.
Dec 28 2018Response to application and application for leave to file the response under seal filed.
Jan 02 2019Reply of applicant and application for leave to file the reply under seal filed.
Jan 07 2019Motion (18M93) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Jan 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2019Application (18A669) referred to the Court.
Jan 08 2019Application (18A669) denied by the Court. The administrative stay previously entered by The Chief Justice is vacated.
Jan 09 2019Motion of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press for leave to intervene to file a motion to unseal.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 14 2019MOTION (18M93) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 17 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2019The applications for leave to file the application for stay, the response, and the reply under seal presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court are granted.
Jan 22 2019Motion (18M93) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record Granted.
Jan 25 2019Response to motion for leave to intervene to file a motion to unseal from United States filed.
Main Document
Jan 25 2019Motion for leave to file redacted copies of the application for stay, response, and reply filed by United States.
Main Document
Jan 25 2019Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Jan 28 2019Reply in support of motion to intervene filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 29 2019Motion of petitioner for an order directing the Clerk to file an unredacted version of petitioner's supplemental brief supporting its petition for certiorari.
Jan 30 2019Motions DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jan 30 2019Response to motion for an order directing the Clerk to file an unredacted version of petitioner's supplemental brief from respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Jan 31 2019Supplement to motion of petitioner for an order directing the Clerk to file an unredacted version of petitioner's supplemental brief supporting its petition for certiorari.
Feb 04 2019Letter of respondent United States filed.
Main Document
Feb 06 2019Letter of petitioner filed.
Main Document
Feb 19 2019Motion to intervene DENIED.
Feb 19 2019Motion for leave to file redacted copies of the application for stay, response, and reply GRANTED.
Feb 21 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2019Motion for leave to file a supplemental brief under seal filed by respondent United States.
Feb 27 2019Reply of petitioner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2019Motion for leave to file a supplemental reply brief under seal with redacted copies for the public record and response to respondent's motion for leave to file a supplemental brief under seal filed by petitioner.
Mar 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 07 2019Response to petitioner's motion for leave to file a supplemental reply brief under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed by respondent United States. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian D. Boone
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
101 S. Tryon Street
Charlotte, NC 28280

(704) 444-1000
Party name: Petitioner
Edward T. KangAlston & Bird LLP
950 F Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

(202) 239-3300
Party name: Petitioner
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543