Docket for 18-9464 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 15 2019 | Application (18A943) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 28, 2019 to May 27, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 20 2019 | Application (18A943) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 27, 2019. | | | May 24 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 28, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jun 25 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 05 2019 | Reply of petitioner Charles Finney filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 09 2019 | Notice of Change of Address of Charles Finney not accepted for filing. (July 12, 2019 - not the type of filing to be submitted through the electronic filing system) | | | Jul 11 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|