SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-9438 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-9438 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Nathaniel Woods, Petitioner
v.
Cynthia Stewart, Warden, et al.
Docketed:
May 28, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-14690)
Decision Date:
February 22, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
May 22 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 27, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Jun 10 2019
Brief of respondent Warden, Holman Correctional Facility in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 27 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Douglas Lloyd
Counsel of Record
The Law Office of J.D. Lloyd
2151 Highland Ave, S
Suite 310
Birmingham, AL 35205
jdlloyd@jdlloydlaw.com
2055383340
Party name: Nathaniel Woods
Attorneys for Respondent
Lauren Ashley Simpson
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General State of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130
lsimpson@ago.state.al.us
3343531209
Party name: Warden, Holman Correctional Facility
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##