Docket for 18-9361 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 29 2019 | Application (18A1024) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 23, 2019 to June 22, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Apr 05 2019 | Application (18A1024) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 22, 2019. | | | May 16 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 20, 2019) | | Petition | Jun 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 20, 2019 to August 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 19, 2019. | | | Aug 20 2019 | Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed. | | Main Document | Sep 05 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|