Docket for 18-9331 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 04 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 17, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix | May 21 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 17, 2019 to July 17, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 23 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 17, 2019. | | | Jun 24 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 17, 2019 to August 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 27 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 16, 2019. | | | Jul 26 2019 | Brief of respondent Tim, Warden Shoop in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 08 2019 | Reply of petitioner Nawaz Ahmed filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 15 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|