SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-9267 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-9267 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
John Loveman Reese, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
May 14, 2019
Linked with 18A976
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC18-815)
Decision Date:
January 4, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2019
Application (18A976) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 4, 2019 to June 3, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Mar 27 2019
Application (18A976) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 3, 2019.
May 10 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 13, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Other
Jun 11 2019
Brief of respondent STATE OF FLORIDA in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 13 2019
Reply of petitioner JOHN REESE filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 27 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christopher James Anderson
Counsel of Record
Law Office of Christopher James Anderson
2217 Florida Blvd.
Neptune Beach, FL 32266
chrisaab1@gmail.com
904-246-4448
Party name: JOHN REESE
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: STATE OF FLORIDA
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##