Docket for 18-9265 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Feb 21 2019 | Application (18A885) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 13, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Feb 28 2019 | Application (18A885) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 10, 2019. | | | May 10 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 13, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Jun 10 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 13, 2019 to June 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 27, 2019. | | | Jun 27 2019 | Brief of respondent Davis in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 15 2019 | Reply of petitioner Segundo filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 18 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|