Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-916
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-916
Title:Thryv, Inc., fka Dex Media, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Click-To-Call Technologies, LP, et al.
Docketed:January 15, 2019
Linked with 18A485
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-1242)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2018Application (18A485) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 14, 2018 to December 14, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 07 2018Application (18A485) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 14, 2018.
Nov 19 2018Application (18A485) to extend further the time from December 14, 2018 to January 11, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Application (18A485) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 11, 2019.
Jan 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2019 to March 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2019 to April 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2019, for all respondents.
Feb 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2019, for all respondents.
Feb 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Frontier Communications Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Association for Accessible Medicines filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Superior Communications, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2019 to May 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 1, 2019, for all respondents.
Mar 26 2019Motion of Click-to-Call Technologies, LP, to extend the time to file a response from May 1, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2019.
May 01 2019Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 08 2019Brief of respondent Click-To-Call Technologies, LP in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2019Reply of petitioner Dex Media, Inc., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
May 28 2019Rescheduled.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jul 09 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 09 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Dex Media, Inc.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 09 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 22, 2019. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including October 7, 2019.
Jul 29 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Dex Media, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jul 29 2019Notice of change of entity name of Dex Media, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Aug 13 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Click-To-Call Technologies, LP,, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 16 2019Joint motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 20 2019Joint motion to further extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is further extended to and including September 3, 2019. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is further extended to and including October 28, 2019.
Aug 23 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Sep 03 2019Brief of Federal Respondent supporting reversal filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 03 2019Brief of petitioner Thryv, Inc., fka Dex Media, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of PTAB Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of Atlanta Gas Light Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of Intel Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Brief amici curiae of ON Semiconductor Corporation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of Superior Communications, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 10 2019Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 9, 2019. VIDED.
Sep 13 2019Motion for divided argument filed by the Solicitor General.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit.
Oct 25 2019CIRCULATED
Oct 28 2019Brief of respondent Click-To-Call Technologies, LP filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2019Record from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer, with the exception of 1 enevelope of confidential documents.
Nov 04 2019Amicus brief of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America not accepted for filing. (November 04, 2019 - Corrected version submitted).
Nov 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed. (November 4, 2019) (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Biotechnology Innovation Organization filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor Stephen I. Vladeck filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2019Motion of Professors of Patent and Administrative Law for leave to file amicus brief submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2019Amicus brief of Power Integrations, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2019Motion for divided argument filed by respondent GRANTED.
Nov 26 2019Reply of petitioner Thryv, Inc., fka Dex Media, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2019Reply of respondent Federal Respondent filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Howard Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-922-7106
Party name: Thryv, Inc., fka Dex Media, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondent
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Click-To-Call Technologies, LP,, et al.
Other
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: Atlanta Gas Light Company
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Professor Stephen I. Vladeck
Paul R. Garcia
    Counsel of Record
Frontier Communications Corporation
401 Merritt Seven
Norwalk, CT 06851

Paul.Garcia@ftr.com
203-614-5214
Party name: Frontier Communications Corporation
Jonathan Alan Herstoff
    Counsel of Record
Haug Partners LLP
745 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10151

jherstoff@haugpartners.com
212-588-0800
Party name: Professors of Patent and Administrative Law
Andrew Martin JacobsSnell & Wilmer LLP
One South Church Avenue
400 East Van Buren Street, Ste.
Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

ajacobs@swlaw.com
602-382-6000
Party name: Superior Communications, Inc.
Barbara A. Jones
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation
601 E Street, NW
Washington, DC 20049

bjones@aarp.org
2024346091
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation
Scott Ethan Kamholz
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

skamholz@cov.com
202-662-5339
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Naresh Kilaru
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner LLC
901 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

naresh.kilaru@finnegan.com
2024084000
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Sydney M. Leach
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer
One Arizona Center
400 East Van Buren, Suite 1900
Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

sleach@swlaw.com
(602) 382 6372
Party name: Superior Communications, Inc.
Erick Joseph Palmer
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

ejpalmer@mayerbrown.com
3127018352
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
William A. Rakoczy
    Counsel of Record
RAKOCZY MOLINO MAZZOCHI SIWIK LLP
6 West Hubbard St.
Suite 500
Chicago, IL 60654

wrakoczy@rmmslegal.com
312-527-2157
Party name: The Association for Accessible Medicines
Irena Royzman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

iroyzman@kramerlevin.com
(212) 715-9152
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Amy Mason Saharia
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

asaharia@wc.com
2024345847
Party name: Biotechnology Innovation Organization
Alexandra Anastasia Ekaterina Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Shapiro Arato Bach LLP
500 Fifth Avenue
40th Floor
New York, NY 10110

ashapiro@shapiroarato.com
212 257-4880
Party name: Power Integrations, Inc.
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: ON Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: PTAB Bar Association
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Streeet NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: Intel Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543