Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8922
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8922
Title:In Re Efrain Campos, Petitioner
Docketed:April 19, 2019
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 29 2018Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Efrain Campos# 374541-A
Columbia Corr. Inst.
P.O. Box 900, CCI-Unit #9
Portage, WI 53901-0900

Party name: Efrain Campos

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543