SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-8848 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-8848 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Antyane Robinson, Petitioner
v.
Pennsylvania
Docketed:
April 16, 2019
Linked with 18A911
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District
Case Numbers:
(720 CAP)
Decision Date:
December 14, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2019
Application (18A911) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 14, 2019 to May 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Mar 08 2019
Application (18A911) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 13, 2019.
Apr 12 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 16, 2019)
Petition
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
May 14 2019
Brief of respondent Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 24 2019
Reply of petitioner Antyane Robinson filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
May 29 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Enid W. Harris
Counsel of Record
Enid W. Harris, Attorney at Law
400 Third Ave., Ste. 111
Kingston, PA 18704
eharris@epix.net
5702887000
Party name: Antyane Robinson
Attorneys for Respondent
Courtney Ellen Hair
Counsel of Record
Cumberland County District Attorney's Office
One Courthouse Square, Room 202
Carlisle, PA 17013
chair@ccpa.net
7172406210
Party name: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##