Docket for 18-879
|
Dec 14 2018 | Application (18A635) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2018 to January 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 18 2018 | Application (18A635) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until January 7, 2019. | | | Jan 07 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2019) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 15 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2019 to March 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 17 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2019. | | | Jan 18 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Electric Power Supply Association, et al.. | | Blanket Consent | Jan 22 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Exelon Corporation, et al.. | | Blanket ConsentProof of Service | Jan 22 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, John B. Rhodes, et al. | | Blanket Consent | Jan 25 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2019 to March 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 25 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2019, for all respondents. | | | Feb 07 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Energy Economists filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 07 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Monitoring Analytics, LLC filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 08 2019 | Brief amici curiae of American Petroleum Institute, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 08 2019 | Brief amici curiae of Industrial Customers filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 11 2019 | Brief of respondents Exelon Corporation, R.E. Ginna Nuclear Power Plant LLC, Constellation Energy Nuclear Group, LLC and Nine Mile Point Nuclear Station, LLC in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 11 2019 | Brief of New York State Respondents in opposition filed. | | OtherMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 26 2019 | Reply of petitioners Electric Power Supply Association, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 27 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019. | | | Apr 15 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|