Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-8776
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-8776
Title:Tam Le, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:April 10, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(18-KP-0085)
   Decision Date:February 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 10, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Apr 16 2019Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 25 2019Response Requested. (Due May 28, 2019)
May 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 28, 2019 to June 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 27, 2019.
Jun 27 2019Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word Count
Jul 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 24 2019Reply of petitioner Tam Le filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 20 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andre Robert Belanger
    Counsel of Record
Manasseh, Gill, Knipe & Belanger
8075 Jefferson Highway
Baton Rouge, LA 70809

andre@manassehandgill.com
225-383-9703
Party name: Tam Le
Tam Le#605788
MPEY/Spruce-4
Louisiana State Prison
Angola, LA 70712

Party name: Tam Le
Attorneys for Respondent
Michelle Ward Ghetti
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General, State of Louisiana
Post Office Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

Ghettim@ag.louisiana.gov
225-485-4421
Party name: Louisiana
Matthew CaplanDistrict Attorney, 22nd Judicial District, State of Louisiana
District Attorney, 22nd Judicial, State of Louisiana
701 North Columbia Street
Covington, LA 70433

mcaplan@22da.com
985-809-8398
Party name: Louisiana

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543