SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-8753 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-8753 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Carl Devon Powell, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:
April 10, 2019
Linked with 18A810
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of California
Case Numbers:
(S043520)
Decision Date:
September 17, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
November 14, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2019
Application (18A810) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2019 to March 29, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Other
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Feb 06 2019
Application (18A810) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 29, 2019.
Mar 27 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 10, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
Appendix
May 06 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2019 to June 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 10, 2019.
Jun 10 2019
Brief of respondent State of California in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jun 27 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neoma D. Kenwood
Counsel of Record
1563 Solano Avenue, #414
Berkeley, CA 94707
nkenwood@capsf.org
4154950500
Party name: Carl Devon Powell
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Edward O'Connor
Counsel of Record
Attorney General's Office
1300 I Street, Suite 125
P.O. Box 944255
Sacramento, CA 94244-2550
paul.oconnor@doj.ca.gov
916 210 7750
Party name: State of California
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##