Docket for 18-8723 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 22 2019 | Application (18A783) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2019 to April 6, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 30 2019 | Application (18A783) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 8, 2019. | | | Apr 03 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 8, 2019) | | PetitionProof of Service | Apr 26 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 8, 2019 to June 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | May 01 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 7, 2019. | | | Jun 07 2019 | Brief of State of Oklahoma in opposition not accepted for filing. (June 10, 2019 - Corrected brief submitted) | | | Jun 07 2019 | Certificate of Service of State of Oklahoma not accepted for filing. (June 10, 2019 - Re-submitted with corrected brief) | | | Jun 07 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Oklahoma in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 27 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|