Docket for 18-8682 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 09 2019 | Application (18A719) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2019 to March 30, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 11 2019 | Application (18A719) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 1, 2019. | | | Apr 01 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 3, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Apr 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2019 to June 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 09 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2019. | | | May 31 2019 | Brief of respondent Wanza Jackson-Mitchell, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 20 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|