Docket for 18-8670 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 30 2019 | Application (18A808) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 14, 2019 to March 31, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | Feb 06 2019 | Application (18A808) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 31, 2019. | | | Mar 29 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 2, 2019) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Apr 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2019 to June 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 3, 2019. | | | May 31 2019 | Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 20 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Jun 20 2019 | Reply of petitioner Demetrius Frazier filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentMain Document | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|