Feb 06 2019 | Application (18A820) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 19, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Feb 12 2019 | Application (18A820) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 21, 2019. |
| |
Mar 21 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 25, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Apr 22 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2019 to May 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 24 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 24, 2019. |
| |
May 22 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 24, 2019 to June 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 24 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 24, 2019. |
| |
Jun 24 2019 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jul 09 2019 | Reply of petitioner Jeffery Wood filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jul 11 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
| |
Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |