Dec 14 2018 | Application (18A650) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2019 to March 11, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Dec 20 2018 | Application (18A650) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 11, 2019. |
| |
Mar 08 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 15, 2019) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther |
Mar 29 2019 | Motion to defer consideration of petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioner Leif Halvorsen. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Apr 15 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2019 to May 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 18 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 15, 2019. |
| |
May 15 2019 | Brief of respondent DeEdra Hart, Warden in opposition filed. |
| Main Document |
May 22 2019 | Reply of petitioner Leif Halvorsen filed. |
| Main DocumentOtherProof of Service |
May 29 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019. |
| |
Jun 17 2019 | Motion to defer consideration of petition for a writ of certiorari DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. |
| |
Jun 17 2019 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
| |