SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-8386 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-8386 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Michael Apelt, Petitioner
v.
Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections
Docketed:
March 12, 2019
Linked with 18A656
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(15-99013, 15-99015)
Decision Date:
December 28, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
October 11, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2018
Application (18A656) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 9, 2019 to March 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Dec 20 2018
Application (18A656) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 10, 2019.
Mar 11 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Apr 02 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2019 to May 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 04 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 13, 2019.
Apr 11 2019
Brief amicus curiae of The Federal Republic of Germany filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 13 2019
Brief of respondent Charles L. Ryan in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 28 2019
Reply of petitioner Michael Apelt filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 29 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005
jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Michael Apelt
Attorneys for Respondent
Lacey Stover Gard
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
400 West Congress Street
Bldg. S-315
Tucson, AZ 85701
lacey.gard@azag.gov
5206286654
Party name: Charles L. Ryan
Other
Owen C. Pell
Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1095
opell@whitecase.com
212-819-8891
Party name: The Federal Republic of Germany
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##