Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-817
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-817
Title:Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Docketed:December 27, 2018
Linked with 18A461
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2707, 2016-2708)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 14, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2018Application (18A461) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 12, 2018 to December 27, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 31 2018Application (18A461) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 27, 2018.
Dec 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 28, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 28, 2019 to February 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2019.
Jan 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property and Innovation Professors, Engine Advocacy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Brief amici curiae of The Association for Accessible Medicines and Certain Individual Companies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief of respondent Vanda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Reply of petitioners Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 15 2019Letter of Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., et al. received.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 18 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 22 2019Amendment to Rule 29.6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed with respect to brief in opposition of respondent Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles Bennett Klein
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1700 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

cklein@winston.com
202-282-5977
Party name: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Nicholas Groombridge
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

ngroombridge@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Vanda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Other
Douglas Clifford Hochstetler
    Counsel of Record
Kelley Drye & Warren LLLLP
333 West Wacker Drive, Suite 2600
Chicago, IL 60606-6402

DHochstetler@KelleyDrye.com
(312) 857-7070
Party name: THE ASSOCIATION FOR ACCESSIBLE MEDICINES AND CERTAIN INDIVIDUAL COMPANIES
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Intellectual Property and Innovation Professors, Engine Advocacy, and The R Street Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543