SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-8070 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-8070 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Billie Wayne Coble, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
February 21, 2019
Linked with 18A845
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
Case Numbers:
(WR-39,707-04)
Decision Date:
February 14, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 21 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 25, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 21 2019
Application (18A845) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 25 2019
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 26 2019
Reply of petitioner Billie Wayne Coble filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 28 2019
Application (18A845) referred to the Court.
Feb 28 2019
Petition DENIED.
Feb 28 2019
Application (18A845) denied by the Court.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allen Richard Ellis
Counsel of Record
75 Magee Ave.
Mill Valley, CA 94941
a.r.ellis@att.net
415-389-6771
Party name: Billie Wayne Coble
Attorneys for Respondent
Gwendolyn Suzanne Vindell
Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
300 W. 15th St.
Austin, TX 78701
gwendolyn.vindell2@oag.texas.gov
5124753448
Party name: Lorie Davis
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##